MN SF1694 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 145 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 145 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
General John Vessey Day June 29 designation
Title
General John Vessey Day June 29 designation
Sponsors
Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] |
Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 145 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-19 | Governor's action Approval 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 126-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 10, 2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance |
2017-05-16 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Rules and Legislative Administration |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Authors added Pappas; Hall |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to State Government Finance |
2017-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Author added Hawj |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2011 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Author added Anselmo