MN SF1682 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Landfill Responsibility Act establishment; tribal access to rural recycling grants authorization; closed landfill investment fund use modification; environmental justice considerations in determining state permitting authorization; biodegradable and compostable labeling requirements modification; climate resiliency program establishment; appropriating money

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landfill Responsibility Act establishment; tribal access to rural recycling grants authorization; closed landfill investment fund use modification; environmental justice considerations in determining state permitting authorization; biodegradable and compostable labeling requirements modification; climate resiliency program establishment; appropriating money

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27SenateAuthor added Dziedzic
2021-03-08SenateAuthors added Dibble; Eaton; McEwen
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
2021-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1734 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback