MN SF1682 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate: HF substituted on General Orders HF1780
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate: HF substituted on General Orders HF1780
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revisor of statutes free state publications recipients survey requirement
Title
Revisor of statutes free state publications recipients survey requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Fobbe [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Katie Sieben [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Senate: HF substituted on General Orders HF1780 | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Author added Sieben | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-19 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-03-19 | Senate: Referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight |