MN SF1673 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chief author added Tomassoni
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chief author added Tomassoni
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Best interest factors for custody determinations modification
Title
Best interest factors for custody determinations modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Chief author added Tomassoni |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Housley |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Author added Ruud |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF963 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law