MN SF1672 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Senate file first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Senate file first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wind easements, options and leases for commercial operation projects effective date delay authorization
Title
Wind easements, options and leases for commercial operation projects effective date delay authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2017-05-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1487 (Similar To) 2017-02-20 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance