MN SF1651 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Political subdivision compensation limit modification and conformance
Title
Political subdivision compensation limit modification and conformance
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF703 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Second reading