MN SF1638 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
911 dispatchers cardiopulmonary resuscitation instruction training requirement and appropriation
Title
911 dispatchers cardiopulmonary resuscitation instruction training requirement and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Erik Simonson [D] |
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Author added Simonson |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1520 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division