MN SF1616 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 32 05/11/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 32 05/11/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children's hospitals contingent alternative medical assistance (MA) payment method authorization
Title
Children's hospitals contingent alternative medical assistance (MA) payment method authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 32 05/11/17 | |
2017-05-15 | Governor's action Approval 05/11/17 | |
2017-05-11 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2017-05-11 | Governor approval | |
2017-05-08 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Returned from House |
2017-05-04 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Third reading |
2017-05-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 04, 2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Second reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1619 |
2017-04-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Authors added Abeler; Hayden |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1619 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - HF indefinitely postponed