MN SF1598 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Lopez Franzen
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Lopez Franzen
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safe Workplaces for Meat and Poultry Processing Workers Act
Title
Safe Workplaces for Meat and Poultry Processing Workers Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Author added Lopez Franzen |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Murphy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF800 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Authors added Klevorn, Vang, Youakim and Jordan