MN SF1587 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Author added Bigham
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Author added Bigham
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child maltreatment investigations face-to-face contact requirement modification
Title
Child maltreatment investigations face-to-face contact requirement modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Author added Mathews |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Author added Coleman |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1202 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Author added Mekeland