MN SF1581 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Author added Clausen
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Author added Clausen
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribed pediatric extended care centers licensure requirement
Title
Prescribed pediatric extended care centers licensure requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1730 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Author added Loeffler.