MN SF1558 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child foster care and background studies provisions modifications
Title
Child foster care and background studies provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Authors added Abeler; Miller; Bigham; Hoffman |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1287 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Author stricken Albright