MN SF1555 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Housley
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Housley
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Career pathway demonstration program creation; independent school district #294, Houston appropriation
Title
Career pathway demonstration program creation; independent school district #294, Houston appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1337 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Author added Bierman