MN SF1549 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishment of Task force on Youth Interventions and prevention services, intervention services, and barrier reduction services appropriation relating to youth involved or at risk of becoming involved in the criminal or juvenile justice system

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishment of Task force on Youth Interventions and prevention services, intervention services, and barrier reduction services appropriation relating to youth involved or at risk of becoming involved in the criminal or juvenile justice system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans
2023-03-06SenateAuthor added Pha
2023-02-16SenateAuthor added Mitchell
2023-02-13SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-02-13SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1712 (Similar To) 2023-02-13 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback