MN SF1544 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Pappas
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Pappas
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution applying to Congress for a limited national convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution that will restore the balance and integrity to our elections
Title
Resolution applying to Congress for a limited national convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution that will restore the balance and integrity to our elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Author stricken Draheim |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3184 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author added Moran