MN SF1541 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Isaacson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Isaacson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Past military service income tax credit increase
Title
Past military service income tax credit increase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Author added Isaacson |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1799 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Author added Heintzeman.