MN SF1534 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota 100 Club special motor vehicle plates establishment; appropriation
Title
Minnesota 100 Club special motor vehicle plates establishment; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
Sen. Ann Johnson Stewart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1204 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means