MN SF1514 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Court hearing on a petition for postconviction relief time period modification
Title
Court hearing on a petition for postconviction relief time period modification
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Authors added Hawj; Hoffman; Latz |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF833 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Authors added Fischer, Hornstein, Agbaje, and Freiberg