MN SF151 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 12 04/03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle forfeiture provisions modification for inclusion of more than one vehicle owner

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle forfeiture provisions modification for inclusion of more than one vehicle owner

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04 Secretary of State Chapter 12 04/03/17
2017-04-04 Governor's action Approval 04/03/17
2017-04-03 Secretary of State, Filed
2017-04-03 Governor approval
2017-03-30 Presented to Governor
2017-03-29SenateReturned from House
2017-03-29HouseBill was passed vote: 128-0
2017-03-29HouseThird reading
2017-03-28HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, March 29, 2017
2017-03-20HouseSecond reading
2017-03-20HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2017-03-16HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF389
2017-03-16HouseReceived from Senate
2017-03-16SenateThird reading Passed vote: 65-0
2017-03-16SenateSpecial Order
2017-01-26SenateSecond reading
2017-01-26SenateComm report: To pass
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2017-01-17SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF389 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Author added Pugh.

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback