MN SF15 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amusement rides and lawn equipment operation by youth effective date change
Title
Amusement rides and lawn equipment operation by youth effective date change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 5 | |
2020-06-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-06-19 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Returned from House |
2020-06-17 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-06-17 | House | Third reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-06-17 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2020-06-17 | House | Second reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-06-16 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Labor |
2020-06-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-12 | Senate | By Motion, Laid on Table |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF70 (Similar To) 2020-06-12 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor