MN SF1497 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce and affordable housing program appropriation
Title
Workforce and affordable housing program appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Richard Cohen [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
Sen. David Tomassoni [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Author added Tomassoni |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1535 (Similar To) 2018-05-15 - Author added Bernardy