MN SF1489 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Wiklund
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Wiklund
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace Officer Standards and Training Board revision of the standards of conduct for police officers requirement
Title
Peace Officer Standards and Training Board revision of the standards of conduct for police officers requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Fateh [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] |
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Author added Wiklund |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Author added Torres Ray |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF593 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Author added Fischer