MN SF1467 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Commission on Data Practices and Personal Data Privacy reestablishment
Title
Legislative Commission on Data Practices and Personal Data Privacy reestablishment
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. James Carlson [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03 Suspended |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Carlson |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1488 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law