MN SF145 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affirmative consent standards in campus sexual assault policies authorization; sexual violence grant program and consent curriculum establishment; sexual violence prevention grants appropriation
Title
Affirmative consent standards in campus sexual assault policies authorization; sexual violence grant program and consent curriculum establishment; sexual violence prevention grants appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] |
Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Author added Frentz |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Author stricken Schoen |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF116 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Author added Hornstein.