MN SF1433 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing assistant training and competency evaluation reimbursable expenses provisions modification
Title
Nursing assistant training and competency evaluation reimbursable expenses provisions modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1400 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1400 (Similar To) 2017-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 71