MN SF1431 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF800, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF800, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Certain labor agreements and memorandums of understanding ratification
Title
Certain labor agreements and memorandums of understanding ratification
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Frentz [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Sen. Jen McEwen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF800, SF indefinitely postponed |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF800 (Similar To) 2023-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 36