MN SF1424 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1826, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1826, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus State Government policy bill
Title
Omnibus State Government policy bill
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1826, SF indefinitely postponed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1826 (Similar To) 2023-04-25 - Third reading Passed