MN SF1417 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education finance general education aid clarification
Title
Education finance general education aid clarification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1312 (Similar To) 2021-04-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means