MN SF1416 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced standard time effective upon authorization by federal law
Title
Advanced standard time effective upon authorization by federal law
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Author stricken Housley |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Author added Hall |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Authors added Newton; Housley |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Local Government |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1397 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Second reading