MN SF1415 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Author added Goggin
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Author added Goggin
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Government-to-government relationship with Minnesota tribal Nations establishment
Title
Government-to-government relationship with Minnesota tribal Nations establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Author added Goggin |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF903 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Author added Haley