MN SF1360 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fraudulent or otherwise improper financing statements felony penalties expansion
Title
Fraudulent or otherwise improper financing statements felony penalties expansion
Sponsors
Sen. Julianne Ortman [R] | Sen. Scott Newman [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] |
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Secretary of State Chapter 306 | |
2014-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Returned from House |
2014-05-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 132-0 |
2014-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2014-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 16, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | House | Second reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-05-13 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1585 |
2014-05-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 55-1 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Author added Newman |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |