MN SF1357 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Author added Dibble
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Author added Dibble
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis medical use federal schedule I exemption commissioner of health application requirement; marijuana and nonsynthetic THC schedule I to schedule II controlled substance reclassification
Title
Cannabis medical use federal schedule I exemption commissioner of health application requirement; marijuana and nonsynthetic THC schedule I to schedule II controlled substance reclassification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Author added Dibble |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Tomassoni |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF675 (Similar To) 2021-02-15 - Author added Garofalo