MN SF1354 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Police and firefighters civil service commissions and department employees provisions modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police and firefighters civil service commissions and department employees provisions modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - House: Passage (Y: 119 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Presented to Governor
2017-05-22SenateReturned from House
2017-05-22HouseBill was passed vote: 119-14
2017-05-22HouseThird reading
2017-05-20HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 22nd, 2017
2017-05-18HouseSecond reading
2017-05-18HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2017-05-17HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1640
2017-05-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-05-16SenateThird reading Passed vote: 64-0
2017-05-16SenateSpecial Order
2017-03-13SenateSecond reading
2017-03-13SenateComm report: To pass
2017-03-08SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Local Government
2017-02-23SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback