MN SF1319 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home and community-based service providers COVID-19 related grants appropriations
Title
Home and community-based service providers COVID-19 related grants appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Author added Dornink |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1175 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Authors added Hamilton and Feist