MN SF1295 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Author added Hall
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Child care authorizations for parenting time clarification; child care reimbursements for parenting time clarification; child care reporting requirements clarification; parenting time presumptions modification; parenting time schedules findings requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care authorizations for parenting time clarification; child care reimbursements for parenting time clarification; child care reporting requirements clarification; parenting time presumptions modification; parenting time schedules findings requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateAuthor added Hall
2019-03-26SenateAuthor stricken Abeler
2019-03-04SenateAuthors added Hoffman; Abeler
2019-02-28SenateAuthor added Koran
2019-02-28SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-02-27SenateAuthor added Kiffmeyer
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Family Care and Aging
2019-02-14SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1666 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Author added Brand

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback