MN SF1284 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Checking account requirements modifications
Title
Checking account requirements modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 21 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Returned from House |
2021-05-14 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Third reading |
2021-05-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 14, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1067 |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1067 (Similar To) 2021-05-15 - Author added Bernardy