MN SF1279 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provision modifications governing adult adoptee access to their own original birth records and other adoption-related information

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provision modifications governing adult adoptee access to their own original birth records and other adoption-related information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-03SenateAuthor added Pha
2023-03-20SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
2023-02-06SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-02-06SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1778 (Similar To) 2023-04-26 - Author added Kozlowski

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback