MN SF1276 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mortgage foreclosures provisions modifications; lenders and servicers loss mitigation requirements
Title
Mortgage foreclosures provisions modifications; lenders and servicers loss mitigation requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] | Sen. Richard Cohen [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] |
Sen. Barbara Goodwin [D] | Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 115 | |
2013-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Returned from House |
2013-05-19 | House | Bill was passed vote: 123-0 |
2013-05-19 | House | Third reading |
2013-05-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 19, 2013 |
2013-05-17 | House | Second reading |
2013-05-17 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1377 |
2013-05-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 61-1 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |