MN SF1263 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus data practices bill
Title
Omnibus data practices bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief author added Limmer |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Abeler |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF631 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Second reading