MN SF1261 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Author added Cwodzinski
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Author added Cwodzinski
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm transfers criminal background checks requirement
Title
Firearm transfers criminal background checks requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Richard Cohen [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Author added Cwodzinski |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Author stricken Schoen |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1669 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Authors added Hausman, Anselmo, Davnie, and Nelson.