MN SF1257 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Senate file first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Background studies requirement exemption for licensed persons; appropriating money

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Background studies requirement exemption for licensed persons; appropriating money

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-17HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy
2022-05-17HouseReceived from Senate
2022-05-17SenateThird reading Passed
2022-05-17SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2022-05-16SenateSecond reading
2022-05-16SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2022-03-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2021-03-10SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2021-03-01SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
2021-03-01SenateAuthor added Hoffman
2021-02-25SenateAuthor added Wiklund
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2021-02-22SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1512 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Authors added Hamilton, Rasmusson, Freiberg, and Bahner

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF1257&ssn=0&y=2021
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1257&version=0&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1257&version=1&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1257&version=2&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1257&version=3&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1257&version=4&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage?session=ls92&number=8481

Bill Comments

feedback