MN SF1254 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cottage food producers organization modifications, exempt foods sales limit increase, registration modifications, and agricultural land requirements for property tax purposes modification
Title
Cottage food producers organization modifications, exempt foods sales limit increase, registration modifications, and agricultural land requirements for property tax purposes modification
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
Sen. Gene Dornink [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Author added Dornink |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1430 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Author added Huot