MN SF1253 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Online content discrimination prohibition and civil action authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Online content discrimination prohibition and civil action authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-17SenateSecond reading
2022-02-17SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2021-03-08SenateSecond reading
2021-03-08SenateComm report: To pass
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
2021-02-22SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1739 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added Lucero

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback