MN SF1228 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Beginning farmer tax credit for sale of an agricultural asset eligibility modification
Title
Beginning farmer tax credit for sale of an agricultural asset eligibility modification
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Gene Dornink [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] |
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1456 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Authors added Rasmusson and Jurgens