MN SF1220 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Gazelka
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Gazelka
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sexually explicit materials involving children penalties increase for creation, distribution, and possession
Title
Sexually explicit materials involving children penalties increase for creation, distribution, and possession
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Author added Gazelka |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Author added Koran |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF229 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Author added Olson, B.