MN SF122 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers compensation relating to data services organizations modifications
Title
Workers compensation relating to data services organizations modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-03-08 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF372 (Similar To) 2021-03-23 - Second reading