MN SF1174 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Commission on Cybersecurity establishment
Title
Legislative Commission on Cybersecurity establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03 Suspended |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Authors added Eichorn; Wiklund |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Technology and Reform Policy |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF66 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - Authors added Elkins, Masin