MN SF1160 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Senate file first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Senate file first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Telehealth Act; task force on creating a person-centered telepresence strategy establishment
Title
Minnesota Telehealth Act; task force on creating a person-centered telepresence strategy establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Finance |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03 Suspended amend previous committee report |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Authors added Nelson; Klein |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1412 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Author added Bahner