MN SF1131 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - HF substituted in committee HF679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - HF substituted in committee HF679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's residential treatment payment provisions effective date modification
Title
Children's residential treatment payment provisions effective date modification
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | HF substituted in committee HF679 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF679 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 12 04/12/2019