MN SF1110 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Carlson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Carlson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water and issuing permits to appropriate water management provisions modifications
Title
Water and issuing permits to appropriate water management provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Carlson |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1491 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Author added Huot